Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HR307

Introduced
2/6/09  
Refer
2/19/09  
Enrolled
3/16/09  

Caption

Paying tribute to the life of William C. Velasquez, founder of the Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, on June 15, 2009, the 21st anniversary of his death.

Impact

The resolution acknowledges the historical context of Velasquez's work and its lasting impact on state laws and the democratic process. By fostering greater Latino engagement in elections, his initiatives have led to a notable increase in the number of registered Hispanic voters and elected officials across the United States. This has implications for the representation of Latino interests in both state and national contexts, providing a framework for future advocacy aimed at increasing voter participation among underrepresented communities.

Summary

HR307 is a resolution that pays tribute to William C. Velasquez, a prominent civil rights advocate focused on increasing Latino voter participation in American elections. The bill commemorates the 21st anniversary of his passing on June 15, 2009, highlighting his significant contributions to the civil rights movement and efforts to amplify the voice of Hispanic Americans in the electoral process. Velasquez founded the Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, which played a key role in educating and mobilizing Hispanic voters since its establishment in 1974.

Contention

Although HR307 is primarily a tribute and does not propose new legislation or alter existing laws, the acknowledgment of Velasquez's contributions can be seen as a rallying point for ongoing discussions about voting rights and representation for Hispanic Americans. Some may argue that while the bill is commendable, it does not address current challenges related to voter suppression or the need for continued advocacy for equitable access to the electoral process. This contrast illustrates the ongoing debates surrounding voting rights in the context of American democracy.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Previously Filed As

TX HR79

Paying tribute to the life of William C. Velasquez, founder of the Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, on June 15, 2016, the 28th anniversary of his death.

TX HR78

Paying tribute to the life of William C. Velasquez, founder of the Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, on June 15, 2015, the 27th anniversary of his death.

TX HR100

Paying tribute to the life of William C. Velasquez, founder of the Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, on June 15, 2018, the 30th anniversary of his death.

TX HR71

Paying tribute to the life of William C. Velasquez, founder of the Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, on June 15, 2017, the 29th anniversary of his death.

TX HR65

Paying tribute to the life of William C. Velasquez, founder of the Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, on June 15, 2013, the 25th anniversary of his death.

TX HR64

Paying tribute to the life of William C. Velasquez, founder of the Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, on June 15, 2014, the 26th anniversary of his death.

TX HR90

Paying tribute to the life of William C. Velasquez, founder of the Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, on June 15, 2011, the 23rd anniversary of his death.

TX HR91

Paying tribute to the life of William C. Velasquez, founder of the Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, on June 15, 2012, the 24th anniversary of his death.

Similar Bills

No similar bills found.