House | 03/18/2009 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 03/16/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 674 | |
House | 03/16/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 674 | |
House | 03/12/2009 | Withdrawn from calendar | Journal Page: 659 | |
House | 03/12/2009 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/10/2009 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 02/26/2009 | Withdrawn from calendar | Journal Page: 452 | |
House | 02/26/2009 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 02/24/2009 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 02/19/2009 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 361 | |
House | 02/10/2009 | Filed |