House | 03/16/2009 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 02/26/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 453 | |
House | 02/26/2009 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 453 | |
House | 02/26/2009 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 02/24/2009 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 02/19/2009 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 362 | |
House | 02/10/2009 | Filed |