LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2009 - 81st Regular
House
Bills
HR404
Action History
TX
Texas House Bill HR404
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2009 - 81st Regular
Texas House Bill HR404
Action History
House
05/29/2009
Considered in Rules and Resolutions
House
03/05/2009
Withdrawn from calendar
Journal Page: 561
House
03/05/2009
Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
House
03/03/2009
Considered in Rules and Resolutions
House
02/19/2009
Referred to Rules & Resolutions
Journal Page: 363
House
02/10/2009
Filed