Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HR482 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.R. No. 482


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, Family, friends, and citizens of Trinity County are
 mourning the loss of Sheriff Brent Lee, who died in the line of duty
 on November 27, 2008, at the age of 58; and
 WHEREAS, Sheriff Lee was responding to a call early
 Thanksgiving morning when his car was involved in a one-vehicle
 accident in heavy fog; and
 WHEREAS, Brent Lee was born in Crockett to Dovie Mae and Dick
 Lee on October 11, 1950; his father served as Trinity County sheriff
 from 1966 to 1972, and he nurtured a lifelong dream of following in
 his father's footsteps; and
 WHEREAS, During his career in law enforcement, Brent Lee
 worked as a state corrections officer and as a member of the
 Livingston Police Department; he retired from the Texas Alcoholic
 Beverage Commission with the rank of lieutenant after three decades
 of service; and
 WHEREAS, A resident of Trinity County for the past seven
 years, he had been appointed sheriff in June 2008 and had won
 election to the post in the general election in November; Sheriff
 Lee was due to start his first full term on January 1, 2009; and
 WHEREAS, With the love and support of his family, Brent Lee
 dedicated himself to preserving the peace and protecting the people
 of his community, and he carried out his duties with compassion, a
 spirit of cooperation, and a keen sense of justice; this greatly
 esteemed Texan will be forever remembered with deep appreciation by
 the citizens he served and with profound affection by all who shared
 in his life; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 81st Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the life of Sheriff Brent Lee and
 extend sincere condolences to the members of his family: to his
 wife, Elizabeth Ann Avery Lee; to his daughters, Lisa Mullins and
 her husband, James, and Patricia Gee and her husband, Anthony; to
 his son, Steven Lee, Jr., and his wife, Chandra; to his brothers,
 Charles M. Lee, Jr., and Bennie L. Lee and his wife, Linda; to his
 grandchildren, Cade and Cael Mullins, Rachel and Sydney Gee, and
 Hayden and Abby Lee; and to his many other relatives and friends;
 and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Brent Lee.
 McReynolds
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 482 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on March 5, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House