Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HR495 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.R. No. 495


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, The 60th birthday of an esteemed Texan is indeed
 cause for celebration, and Sheila Kay Rinehart of Plano marked this
 memorable milestone in her life on February 10, 2009; and
 WHEREAS, The daughter of Johnny Jim "Bud" Funderburgh and
 Patricia Funderburgh, the former Sheila Funderburgh was born in
 Richardson on February 10, 1949; she graduated from Richardson High
 School and attended Tyler Junior College before joining Braniff
 Airways as a flight attendant; and
 WHEREAS, On September 3, 1977, she married the love of her
 life, Neil Rinehart, and the couple went on to become the parents of
 two treasured children, Allison and Matthew, who to this day remain
 enthusiastic members of their mother's fan club and talk to her
 daily by phone; in 2003, Mrs. Rinehart welcomed her son-in-law,
 Justin, into the family with open arms, and, four years later, the
 Rineharts were blessed with a beloved grandson, Greyson, who calls
 Mrs. Rinehart by the affectionate nickname "Mimi"; and
 WHEREAS, This devoted wife, mother, grandmother, and friend
 is also known as "the decorator" for her impeccable interior design
 skills, but she is somewhat less noted for her expertise in the
 culinary arts, although family members do admire her ability to
 make reservations; and
 WHEREAS, A respected citizen of Plano, where she has lived
 since 1980, Mrs. Rinehart belongs to the Junior League and numerous
 other clubs and community organizations; while she reveals a soft
 side in her affection for her dogs and her loyal support of the
 Texas Rangers baseball team, she is a fearsome opponent at Pokeno
 and Canasta; and
 WHEREAS, Sheila Rinehart is occasionally prone to
 spontaneous twirling, an expression of the joie de vivre that
 brings laughter and warmth to the lives of all who are privileged to
 know her; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 81st Texas
 Legislature hereby congratulate Sheila Kay Rinehart on her 60th
 birthday and extend to her sincere best wishes for continued
 happiness; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for Mrs. Rinehart as an expression of high regard by the
 Texas House of Representatives.
 McCall
 Straus Gattis Menendez Straus Gattis Menendez
Straus Gattis Menendez
 Allen Geren Merritt Allen Geren Merritt
Allen Geren Merritt
 Alonzo Giddings Miklos Alonzo Giddings Miklos
Alonzo Giddings Miklos
 Alvarado Gonzales Miller of Comal Alvarado Gonzales Miller of Comal
Alvarado Gonzales Miller of Comal
 Anchia Gonzalez Toureilles Miller of Erath Anchia Gonzalez Toureilles Miller of Erath
Anchia Gonzalez Toureilles Miller of Erath
 Anderson Guillen Moody Anderson Guillen Moody
Anderson Guillen Moody
 Aycock Gutierrez Morrison Aycock Gutierrez Morrison
Aycock Gutierrez Morrison
 Berman Hamilton Naishtat Berman Hamilton Naishtat
Berman Hamilton Naishtat
 Bohac Hancock Oliveira Bohac Hancock Oliveira
Bohac Hancock Oliveira
 Bolton Hardcastle Olivo Bolton Hardcastle Olivo
Bolton Hardcastle Olivo
 Bonnen Harless Orr Bonnen Harless Orr
Bonnen Harless Orr
 Branch Harper-Brown Ortiz, Jr. Branch Harper-Brown Ortiz, Jr.
Branch Harper-Brown Ortiz, Jr.
 Brown of Kaufman Hartnett Otto Brown of Kaufman Hartnett Otto
Brown of Kaufman Hartnett Otto
 Brown of Brazos Heflin Parker Brown of Brazos Heflin Parker
Brown of Brazos Heflin Parker
 Burnam Hernandez Patrick Burnam Hernandez Patrick
Burnam Hernandez Patrick
 Button Herrero Paxton Button Herrero Paxton
Button Herrero Paxton
 Callegari Hilderbran Pena Callegari Hilderbran Pena
Callegari Hilderbran Pena
 Castro Hochberg Phillips Castro Hochberg Phillips
Castro Hochberg Phillips
 Chavez Hodge Pickett Chavez Hodge Pickett
Chavez Hodge Pickett
 Chisum Homer Pierson Chisum Homer Pierson
Chisum Homer Pierson
 Christian Hopson Pitts Christian Hopson Pitts
Christian Hopson Pitts
 Cohen Howard of Fort Bend Quintanilla Cohen Howard of Fort Bend Quintanilla
Cohen Howard of Fort Bend Quintanilla
 Coleman Howard of Travis Raymond Coleman Howard of Travis Raymond
Coleman Howard of Travis Raymond
 Cook Hughes Riddle Cook Hughes Riddle
Cook Hughes Riddle
 Corte Hunter Rios Ybarra Corte Hunter Rios Ybarra
Corte Hunter Rios Ybarra
 Crabb Isett Ritter Crabb Isett Ritter
Crabb Isett Ritter
 Craddick Jackson Rodriguez Craddick Jackson Rodriguez
Craddick Jackson Rodriguez
 Creighton Jones Rose Creighton Jones Rose
Creighton Jones Rose
 Crownover Keffer Sheffield Crownover Keffer Sheffield
Crownover Keffer Sheffield
 Darby Kent Shelton Darby Kent Shelton
Darby Kent Shelton
 Davis of Harris King of Parker Smith of Tarrant Davis of Harris King of Parker Smith of Tarrant
Davis of Harris King of Parker Smith of Tarrant
 Davis of Dallas King of Taylor Smith of Harris Davis of Dallas King of Taylor Smith of Harris
Davis of Dallas King of Taylor Smith of Harris
 Deshotel King of Zavala Smithee Deshotel King of Zavala Smithee
Deshotel King of Zavala Smithee
 Driver Kleinschmidt Solomons Driver Kleinschmidt Solomons
Driver Kleinschmidt Solomons
 Dukes Kolkhorst Strama Dukes Kolkhorst Strama
Dukes Kolkhorst Strama
 Dunnam Kuempel Swinford Dunnam Kuempel Swinford
Dunnam Kuempel Swinford
 Dutton Laubenberg Taylor Dutton Laubenberg Taylor
Dutton Laubenberg Taylor
 Edwards Legler Thibaut Edwards Legler Thibaut
Edwards Legler Thibaut
 Eiland Leibowitz Thompson Eiland Leibowitz Thompson
Eiland Leibowitz Thompson
 Eissler Lewis Truitt Eissler Lewis Truitt
Eissler Lewis Truitt
 Elkins Lucio III Turner of Tarrant Elkins Lucio III Turner of Tarrant
Elkins Lucio III Turner of Tarrant
 England Madden Turner of Harris England Madden Turner of Harris
England Madden Turner of Harris
 Farabee Maldonado Vaught Farabee Maldonado Vaught
Farabee Maldonado Vaught
 Farias Mallory Caraway Veasey Farias Mallory Caraway Veasey
Farias Mallory Caraway Veasey
 Farrar Marquez Villarreal Farrar Marquez Villarreal
Farrar Marquez Villarreal
 Fletcher Martinez Vo Fletcher Martinez Vo
Fletcher Martinez Vo
 Flores Martinez Fischer Walle Flores Martinez Fischer Walle
Flores Martinez Fischer Walle
 Flynn McCall Weber Flynn McCall Weber
Flynn McCall Weber
 Frost McClendon Woolley Frost McClendon Woolley
Frost McClendon Woolley
 Gallego McReynolds Zerwas Gallego McReynolds Zerwas
Gallego McReynolds Zerwas
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 495 was adopted by the House on
 February 18, 2009, by a non-record vote.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House



Straus Gattis Menendez

Allen Geren Merritt

Alonzo Giddings Miklos

Alvarado Gonzales Miller of Comal

Anchia Gonzalez Toureilles Miller of Erath

Anderson Guillen Moody

Aycock Gutierrez Morrison

Berman Hamilton Naishtat

Bohac Hancock Oliveira

Bolton Hardcastle Olivo

Bonnen Harless Orr

Branch Harper-Brown Ortiz, Jr.

Brown of Kaufman Hartnett Otto

Brown of Brazos Heflin Parker

Burnam Hernandez Patrick

Button Herrero Paxton

Callegari Hilderbran Pena

Castro Hochberg Phillips

Chavez Hodge Pickett

Chisum Homer Pierson

Christian Hopson Pitts

Cohen Howard of Fort Bend Quintanilla

Coleman Howard of Travis Raymond

Cook Hughes Riddle

Corte Hunter Rios Ybarra

Crabb Isett Ritter

Craddick Jackson Rodriguez

Creighton Jones Rose

Crownover Keffer Sheffield

Darby Kent Shelton

Davis of Harris King of Parker Smith of Tarrant

Davis of Dallas King of Taylor Smith of Harris

Deshotel King of Zavala Smithee

Driver Kleinschmidt Solomons

Dukes Kolkhorst Strama

Dunnam Kuempel Swinford

Dutton Laubenberg Taylor

Edwards Legler Thibaut

Eiland Leibowitz Thompson

Eissler Lewis Truitt

Elkins Lucio III Turner of Tarrant

England Madden Turner of Harris

Farabee Maldonado Vaught

Farias Mallory Caraway Veasey

Farrar Marquez Villarreal

Fletcher Martinez Vo

Flores Martinez Fischer Walle

Flynn McCall Weber

Frost McClendon Woolley

Gallego McReynolds Zerwas