H.R. No. 732 R E S O L U T I O N WHEREAS, Leon Abrusley served his country bravely during World War II as a seaman first class in the United States Navy; and WHEREAS, Mr. Abrusley was born into a family of Syrian immigrants in Oakdale, Louisiana, on August 12, 1924; on December 23, 1941, 16 days after the attack on Pearl Harbor, he answered his nation's call to duty and enlisted in the navy, at the age of 17; and WHEREAS, Seaman Abrusley was assigned to a destroyer in the Pacific theater, the USS Henley; during an engagement off the coast of New Guinea on October 3, 1943, the Henley was sunk by Japanese torpedoes; Seaman Abrusley was one of only 243 survivors who made it into the life rafts; and WHEREAS, Adrift in the sea in the pouring rain, Seaman Abrusley thought of the oil derricks he'd seen while passing through Kilgore, Texas, and promised himself he'd survive to return there and work in the oil fields; eventually he was rescued by another U.S. destroyer, the USS Reid; and WHEREAS, After recovering from his ordeal, Seaman Abrusley joined the crew of the USS Pritchett on January 15, 1944, and remained with that ship until the end of the war; during his service with the Pritchett, he saw duty in the waters off Saipan, Guam, the Philippines, Iwo Jima, and Okinawa; the Pritchett sustained several kamikaze hits by Japanese planes over the course of that period, and in July 1945, it rescued crew members of the USS Callaghan, after that ship was sunk; and WHEREAS, Following his discharge from the service, Mr. Abrusley earned a degree in petroleum engineering from Louisiana State University, which led to a successful 30-year career with Skelly Oil in Carthage, Texas, not far from Kilgore; he later retired with his family to Houston; and WHEREAS, Leon Abrusley is a distinguished member of that proud generation of brave Americans who stepped forward to defend their country during one of its darkest hours, and his courage and perseverance in the face of great danger have earned him the lasting gratitude of his fellow citizens; now, therefore, be it RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 81st Texas Legislature hereby commend Leon Abrusley for his service to the nation during World War II and extend to him sincere best wishes for continued success and happiness; and, be it further RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be prepared for Mr. Abrusley as an expression of high regard by the Texas House of Representatives. Bohac ______________________________ Speaker of the House I certify that H.R. No. 732 was adopted by the House on March 19, 2009, by a non-record vote. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House