House | 04/14/2009 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1126 | |
House | 04/08/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 1126 | |
House | 03/19/2009 | Withdrawn from calendar | Journal Page: 770 | |
House | 03/19/2009 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/17/2009 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 03/12/2009 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 666 | |
House | 03/06/2009 | Filed |