House | 04/13/2009 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1162 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 1162 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 03/26/2009 | Withdrawn from calendar | Journal Page: 929 | |
House | 03/26/2009 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 03/16/2009 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 686 | |
House | 03/13/2009 | Filed |