House | 05/21/2009 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 05/19/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4058 | |
House | 05/19/2009 | Record vote | RV#978 | Journal Page: 4058 |
House | 05/19/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 4058 | |
House | 05/19/2009 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 4058 | |
House | 05/06/2009 | Placed on Resolutions Calendar | ||
House | 05/04/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1014 | |
House | 03/24/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/16/2009 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 686 | |
House | 03/13/2009 | Filed |