House | 03/16/2009 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 02/26/2009 | Adopted | Journal Page: 447 | |
House | 02/26/2009 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 447 | |
House | 02/26/2009 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 02/24/2009 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 02/18/2009 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 337 | |
House | 01/13/2009 | Filed |