Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            ****************************************************************
 ********
 **** A link to the text of the Conference Committee Report****
 **** on the General Appropriations Bill (S.B. No. 1) adopted****
 **** by the Senate and House can be found on the Legislative****
 **** Budget Board's website. The URL is:****
 ********
 ****http://www.lbb.state.tx.us/****
 ********
 ****************************************************************
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1 passed the Senate on
 April 1, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 26, Nays 5;
 April 24, 2009, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and
 requested appointment of Conference Committee; April 28, 2009,
 House granted request of the Senate; May 28, 2009, Senate adopted
 Conference Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 29,
 Nays 2; passed subject to the provisions of Article III,
 Section 49a, of the Constitution of Texas.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1 passed the House, with
 amendments, on April 17, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 149,
 Nays 0; April 28, 2009, House granted request of the Senate for
 appointment of Conference Committee; May 29, 2009, House adopted
 Conference Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 142,
 Nays 2, one present not voting; passed subject to the provisions of
 Article III, Section 49a, of the Constitution of Texas.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 I, Susan Combs, Comptroller of
 ______________________________ Public Accounts, do hereby
 Governor certify that the amounts
 appropriated in the herein
 S.B. No. 1, Regular Session,
 81st Legislature, are within the
 amount estimated to be available
 in the affected fund.
 Certified _____________, 2009.
 ______________________________
 Comptroller of Public Accounts