Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4526
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4526
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5194
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5194
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5138
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5138
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5138
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2638
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#983
|
Journal Page: 4089
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4089
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Martinez Fischer
|
Journal Page: 4089
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4089
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4003
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
5-Alvarado
|
Journal Page: 4003
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Amendment amended
|
6-Alvarado
|
Journal Page: 4003
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
5-Alvarado
|
Journal Page: 4001
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Amended
|
4-Martinez Fischer
|
Journal Page: 4000
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3997
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3175
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Referred to Insurance
|
|
Journal Page: 1206
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1206
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1070
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 900
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 848
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 848
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 848
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 848
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 848
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 848
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 848
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 599
|
Senate
|
03/16/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2009
|
Referred to Government Organization
|
|
Journal Page: 408
|
Senate
|
03/04/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 408
|
Senate
|
02/20/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|