E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5157
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5156
|
House
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6968
|
Senate
|
06/02/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5152
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5038
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6038
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4723
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4723
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 4723
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4720
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2572
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#956
|
Journal Page: 3981
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3981
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3981
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3890
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3890
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2870
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Referred to Border & Intergovernmental Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1597
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1597
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1148
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 980
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 920
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 920
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 920
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 919
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 919
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 919
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 919
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2009
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 599
|
Senate
|
03/16/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2009
|
Referred to Government Organization
|
|
Journal Page: 408
|
Senate
|
03/04/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 408
|
Senate
|
02/20/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|