E
|
05/27/2009
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
05/27/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4093
|
E
|
05/19/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2568
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4073
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2534
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2568
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3951
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2507
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 2507
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2507
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2498
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2368
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3307
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#784
|
Journal Page: 3306
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3306
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3306
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3248
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3248
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 2033
|
Journal Page: 3248
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3302
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Referred to Public Safety
|
|
Journal Page: 1206
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1206
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1070
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 900
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 848
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 848
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 848
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 848
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 848
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 848
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 848
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 727
|
Senate
|
03/23/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2009
|
Referred to Government Organization
|
|
Journal Page: 408
|
Senate
|
03/04/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 408
|
Senate
|
02/26/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|