House
|
05/23/2009
|
Point of order sustained
|
Rule 14, Section 4
|
Journal Page: 4380
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4221
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Referred to Insurance
|
|
Journal Page: 1717
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1717
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1656
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1299
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1222
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1222
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1222
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1222
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1222
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Amendment tabled
|
|
Journal Page: 1221
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA15 Gallegos
|
Journal Page: 1220
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 1212
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1203
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Amendment amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1203
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Amendment to amendment offered
|
FA6 Hinojosa
|
Journal Page: 1202
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1202
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1197
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1197
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 899
|
Senate
|
04/06/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Recommitted to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 878
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 880
|
Senate
|
03/30/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2009
|
Meeting cancelled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2009
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2009
|
Referred to Government Organization
|
|
Journal Page: 506
|
Senate
|
03/16/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 506
|
Senate
|
03/02/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|