House | 05/15/2009 | Referred to Land & Resource Management | Journal Page: 3799 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3799 | |
House | 05/11/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3173 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2308 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2210 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2210 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2210 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2210 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2210 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2210 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Amended | Journal Page: 2210 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Shapleigh | Journal Page: 2209 |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2209 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2209 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Motion withdrawn | Journal Page: 2208 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Motion to suspend regular order of business | Journal Page: 2208 | |
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 2141 | |
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 2139 | |
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 473 | |
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 473 | |
Senate | 02/20/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/20/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |