House | 05/23/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/21/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/20/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/20/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/20/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4315 | |
House | 05/18/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/18/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/18/2009 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 3864 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 3799 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3799 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3677 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2442 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2388 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2388 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2388 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2387 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2387 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2387 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2387 | |
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 2142 | |
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1140 | |
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | Journal Page: 474 | |
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 474 | |
Senate | 02/20/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/20/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |