E
|
05/23/2009
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
05/23/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
E
|
05/14/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2395
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3673
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2370
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2395
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2316
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#749
|
Journal Page: 3216
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3216
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3216
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3190
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3190
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB2653
|
Journal Page: 3190
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2870
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 1206
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1206
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1071
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 900
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 848
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 848
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 848
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 848
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 848
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 848
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 848
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 727
|
Senate
|
03/24/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2009
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 681
|
Senate
|
03/23/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2009
|
Referred to International Relations and Trade
|
|
Journal Page: 476
|
Senate
|
03/13/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 476
|
Senate
|
02/20/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|