Senate | 04/23/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1370 | |
House | 04/21/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1654 | |
House | 04/21/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1654 | |
House | 04/16/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1269 | |
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1108 | |
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1041 | |
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1041 | |
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1041 | |
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1041 | |
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1033 | |
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1032 | |
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 924 | |
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 882 | |
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 852 | |
Senate | 04/01/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/01/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 838 | |
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 476 | |
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 476 | |
Senate | 02/20/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/20/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |