Senate | 04/07/2009 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 910 | |
Senate | 04/07/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 910 | |
Senate | 02/17/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 233 | |
Senate | 02/09/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 155 | |
Senate | 02/03/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 130 | |
Senate | 02/02/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 68 | |
Senate | 01/27/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 38 | |
Senate | 01/26/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 32 | |
Senate | 11/10/2008 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/10/2008 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |