Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1067 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Wentworth S.B. No. 1067
 (In the Senate - Filed February 23, 2009; March 13, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Jurisprudence;
 March 30, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 6,
 Nays 0; March 30, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the composition of the jury in certain adjudication
 hearings in juvenile court.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsection (c), Section 54.03, Family Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (c) Trial shall be by jury unless jury is waived in
 accordance with Section 51.09. If the hearing is on a petition that
 has been approved by the grand jury under Section 53.045, the jury
 must consist of 12 persons and be selected in accordance with the
 requirements in criminal cases. If the hearing is on a petition
 that alleges conduct that violates a penal law of this state of the
 grade of misdemeanor, the jury must consist of the number of persons
 required by Article 33.01(b), Code of Criminal Procedure. Jury
 verdicts under this title must be unanimous.
 SECTION 2. Subsection (c), Section 54.03, Family Code, as
 amended by this Act, applies to an adjudication hearing conducted
 in a juvenile court for which a jury is selected on or after the
 effective date of this Act, regardless of the date the petition on
 which the hearing is based was filed.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *