House | 04/16/2009 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 1267 | |
House | 04/16/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1267 | |
House | 04/06/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1091 | |
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 900 | |
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 859 | |
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 859 | |
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 859 | |
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 859 | |
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 859 | |
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 859 | |
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 859 | |
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 852 | |
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 777 | |
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 756 | |
Senate | 03/26/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/26/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/25/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/25/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/25/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/25/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Referred to Veteran Affairs & Military Instal | Journal Page: 478 | |
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 478 | |
Senate | 02/23/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/23/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |