Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1085 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Shapleigh S.B. No. 1085
 (In the Senate - Filed February 24, 2009; March 13, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on International Relations and
 Trade; March 26, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0;
 March 26, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1085 By: Davis


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a report to the legislature and the Legislative Budget
 Board regarding funding for campuses of public institutions of
 higher education located outside the United States.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter C, Chapter 61, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 61.0691 to read as follows:
 Sec. 61.0691.  REPORT ON FUNDING FOR CAMPUSES LOCATED
 OUTSIDE UNITED STATES. (a)  Each biennium, the board shall require
 each university system or institution of higher education that
 maintains a campus outside the United States to report to the board
 detailed information regarding the sources of funding for the
 campus, including the tuition and fees charged to students enrolled
 at the campus, and the manner in which the funds are disbursed.
 (b)  Not later than December 1 of each even-numbered year,
 the board shall prepare and submit to the presiding officer of each
 house of the legislature and to the Legislative Budget Board a
 written report based on the information received by the board under
 Subsection (a).
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *