Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1096 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Carona S.B. No. 1096
 (In the Senate - Filed February 24, 2009; March 13, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business and Commerce;
 April 8, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 8,
 Nays 0; April 8, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certain charges included in a retail installment
 agreement.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsections (b) and (c), Section 345.251,
 Finance Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (b) If a documentary fee is charged under this section the
 fee:
 (1) must be charged to cash buyers and credit buyers;
 (2) may not exceed $100 [$50]; and
 (3) must be disclosed on the retail installment
 contract as a separate itemized charge.
 (c) A preliminary work sheet on which a sale price is
 computed and that is shown to the retail buyer, an order from the
 buyer, or a retail installment contract must include in reasonable
 proximity to the place on the document where the documentary fee is
 disclosed:
 (1) the amount of the fee; and
 (2) the following notice in type that is bold-faced,
 capitalized, or underlined or otherwise conspicuously set out from
 the surrounding written material:
 "A DOCUMENTARY FEE IS NOT AN OFFICIAL FEE. A DOCUMENTARY FEE IS NOT
 REQUIRED BY LAW, BUT MAY BE CHARGED TO BUYERS FOR HANDLING DOCUMENTS
 AND PERFORMING SERVICES RELATING TO THE CLOSING OF A SALE. A
 DOCUMENTARY FEE MAY NOT EXCEED $100 [$50]. THIS NOTICE IS REQUIRED
 BY LAW."
 SECTION 2. Subsection (c), Section 348.006, Finance Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (c) For a documentary fee to be included in the principal
 balance of a retail installment contract:
 (1) the retail seller must charge the documentary fee
 to cash buyers and credit buyers;
 (2) the documentary fee may not exceed $100 [$50] for a
 motor vehicle retail installment contract or a reasonable amount
 agreed to by the retail seller and retail buyer for a heavy
 commercial vehicle retail installment contract; and
 (3) the buyer's order and the retail installment
 contract must include:
 (A) a statement of the amount of the documentary
 fee; and
 (B) in reasonable proximity to the place in each
 where the amount of the documentary fee is disclosed, the following
 notice in type that is bold-faced, capitalized, underlined, or
 otherwise conspicuously set out from surrounding written material:
 "A DOCUMENTARY FEE IS NOT AN OFFICIAL FEE. A DOCUMENTARY FEE IS NOT
 REQUIRED BY LAW, BUT MAY BE CHARGED TO BUYERS FOR HANDLING DOCUMENTS
 AND PERFORMING SERVICES RELATING TO THE CLOSING OF A SALE. A
 DOCUMENTARY FEE MAY NOT EXCEED $100 [$50] FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE
 CONTRACT OR A REASONABLE AMOUNT AGREED TO BY THE PARTIES FOR A HEAVY
 COMMERCIAL VEHICLE CONTRACT. THIS NOTICE IS REQUIRED BY LAW."
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *