House | 05/07/2009 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 2865 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2865 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2430 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1997 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1923 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1923 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1923 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1923 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1790 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1790 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1790 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1780 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1370 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1353 | |
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 976 | |
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Rereferred to committee | Journal Page: 976 | |
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | Journal Page: 481 | |
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 481 | |
Senate | 02/24/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/24/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |