E | 05/23/2009 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/23/2009 | Signed by the Governor | ||
E | 05/14/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2395 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3673 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2370 | |
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2395 | |
Senate | 05/13/2009 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2316 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Record vote | RV#749 | Journal Page: 3215 |
House | 05/12/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 3215 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3215 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3186 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3186 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB1004 | Journal Page: 3186 |
House | 05/05/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/04/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2553 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/30/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/30/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 1597 | |
House | 04/20/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1597 | |
House | 04/16/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1271 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1141 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1061 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1061 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1061 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1061 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1061 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1061 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1061 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/07/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/07/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 921 | |
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Referred to Economic Development | Journal Page: 481 | |
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 481 | |
Senate | 02/24/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/24/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |