House
|
05/22/2009
|
1 hr. notice-to suspend rules
|
|
Journal Page: 4334
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3440
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Reported favorably as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Referred to Insurance
|
|
Journal Page: 2206
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2206
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1869
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1611
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1390
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1390
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1390
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1390
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1390
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1390
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1390
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1140
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2009
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 481
|
Senate
|
03/13/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 481
|
Senate
|
02/24/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|