House | 05/20/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/20/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/20/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/20/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/20/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/07/2009 | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs | Journal Page: 2864 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2864 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2432 | |
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2049 | |
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1961 | |
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1961 | |
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1961 | |
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1961 | |
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1961 | |
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1961 | |
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Amended | Journal Page: 1960 | |
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Huffman | Journal Page: 1959 |
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1959 | |
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1959 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1780 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1616 | |
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1140 | |
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/18/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 584 | |
Senate | 02/10/2009 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 192 | |
Senate | 02/10/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 192 | |
Senate | 11/10/2008 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/10/2008 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |