Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB112 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Ellis, Van de Putte S.B. No. 112
 (In the Senate - Filed November 10, 2008; February 10, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 April 17, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; April 17, 2009,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 112 By: Ellis


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment of veterans court programs in this
 state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subtitle E, Title 7, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Chapter 617 to read as follows:
 Sec. 617.001.  VETERANS COURT PROGRAM DEFINED; PROCEDURES
 FOR CERTAIN DEFENDANTS. (a)  In this chapter, "veterans court
 program" means a program that has the following essential
 characteristics:
 (1)  the integration of services in the processing of
 cases in the judicial system;
 (2)  the use of a nonadversarial approach involving
 prosecutors and defense attorneys to promote public safety and to
 protect the due process rights of program participants;
 (3)  early identification and prompt placement of
 eligible participants in the program;
 (4)  access to a continuum of alcohol, controlled
 substance, mental health, and other related treatment and
 rehabilitative services;
 (5)  careful monitoring of treatment and services
 provided to program participants;
 (6)  a coordinated strategy to govern program responses
 to participants' compliance;
 (7)  ongoing judicial interaction with program
 participants;
 (8)  monitoring and evaluation of program goals and
 effectiveness;
 (9)  continuing interdisciplinary education to promote
 effective program planning, implementation, and operations; and
 (10)  development of partnerships with public agencies
 and community organizations, including the United States
 Department of Veterans Affairs.
 (b)  If a defendant successfully completes a veterans court
 program after notice to the attorney representing the state and a
 hearing in the veterans court at which that court determines that a
 dismissal is in the best interest of justice, the court in which the
 criminal case is pending shall dismiss the criminal action against
 the defendant and enter an order of expunction under Chapter 55,
 Code of Criminal Procedure, regardless of whether the defendant was
 convicted of the offense for which the defendant entered the
 program or whether the court deferred further proceedings without
 entering an adjudication of guilt.
 Sec. 617.002.  AUTHORITY TO ESTABLISH PROGRAM; ELIGIBILITY.
 (a)  The commissioners court of a county may establish a veterans
 court program for persons arrested for, charged with, or convicted
 of any misdemeanor or felony offense. A defendant is eligible to
 participate in a veterans court program established under this
 chapter only if the attorney representing the state consents to the
 defendant's participation in the program and if the court in which
 the criminal case is pending finds that the defendant:
 (1)  is a veteran or current member of the United States
 armed forces, including a member of the reserves, national guard,
 or state guard; and
 (2)  suffers from a brain injury or mental illness
 that:
 (A)  resulted from the defendant's military
 service in a combat zone or other similar hazardous duty area; and
 (B)  materially affected the defendant's criminal
 conduct at issue in the case.
 (b)  The court in which the criminal case is pending shall
 allow an eligible defendant to choose whether to proceed through
 the veterans court program or otherwise through the criminal
 justice system.
 (c)  Proof of matters described by Subsection (a) may be
 submitted to the court in which the criminal case is pending in any
 form the court determines to be appropriate, including military
 service and medical records, previous determinations of a
 disability by a veteran's organization or by the United States
 Department of Veterans Affairs, testimony or affidavits of other
 veterans or service members, and prior determinations of
 eligibility for benefits by any state or county veterans office.
 The court's findings must accompany any docketed case.
 Sec. 617.003.  DUTIES OF VETERANS COURT. (a)  A veterans
 court program established under this chapter must:
 (1)  ensure a person eligible for the program is
 provided legal counsel before volunteering to proceed through the
 program and while participating in the program;
 (2)  allow a participant to withdraw from the program
 at any time before a trial on the merits has been initiated;
 (3)  provide a participant with a court-ordered
 individualized treatment plan indicating the services that will be
 provided to the participant; and
 (4)  ensure that the jurisdiction of the veterans court
 continues for a period of not less than six months but does not
 continue beyond the period of community supervision for the offense
 charged.
 (b)  A veterans court program established under this chapter
 shall make, establish, and publish local procedures to ensure
 maximum participation of eligible defendants in the county or
 counties in which those defendants reside.
 (c)  This chapter does not prevent the initiation of
 procedures under Chapter 46B, Code of Criminal Procedure.
 Sec. 617.004.  ESTABLISHMENT OF REGIONAL PROGRAM. The
 commissioners courts of two or more counties may elect to establish
 a regional veterans court program under this chapter for the
 participating counties.
 Sec. 617.005.  OVERSIGHT. (a)  The lieutenant governor and
 the speaker of the house of representatives may assign to
 appropriate legislative committees duties relating to the
 oversight of veterans court programs established under this
 chapter.
 (b)  A legislative committee or the governor may request the
 state auditor to perform a management, operations, or financial or
 accounting audit of a veterans court program established under this
 chapter.
 (c)  A veterans court program established under this chapter
 shall:
 (1)  notify the criminal justice division of the
 governor's office before or on implementation of the program; and
 (2)  provide information regarding the performance of
 the program to that division on request.
 Sec. 617.006.  FEES. (a)  A veterans court program
 established under this chapter may collect from a participant in
 the program:
 (1) a reasonable program fee not to exceed $1,000; and
 (2)  a testing, counseling, and treatment fee in an
 amount necessary to cover the costs of any testing, counseling, or
 treatment performed or provided under the program.
 (b)  Fees collected under this section may be paid on a
 periodic basis or on a deferred payment schedule at the discretion
 of the judge, magistrate, or program director administering the
 program. The fees must be:
 (1) based on the participant's ability to pay; and
 (2) used only for purposes specific to the program.
 Sec. 617.007.  SUSPENSION OR DISMISSAL OF COMMUNITY SERVICE
 REQUIREMENT. (a)  Notwithstanding Section 16, Article 42.12, Code
 of Criminal Procedure, to encourage participation in a veterans
 court program established under this chapter, the judge or
 magistrate administering the program may suspend any requirement
 that, as a condition of community supervision, a participant in the
 program work a specified number of hours at a community service
 project or projects.
 (b)  On a participant's successful completion of a veterans
 court program, a judge or magistrate may excuse the participant
 from any condition of community supervision previously suspended
 under Subsection (a).
 SECTION 2. Subsection (b), Article 55.01, Code of Criminal
 Procedure, is amended to read as follows:
 (b) Except as provided by Subsection (c) [of this section],
 a district court may expunge all records and files relating to the
 arrest of a person who has been arrested for commission of a felony
 or misdemeanor under the procedure established under Article 55.02
 [of this code] if the person [is]:
 (1) is tried for the offense for which the person was
 arrested,[;
 [(2)] convicted of the offense,[;] and
 [(3)] acquitted by the court of criminal appeals; or
 (2)  in connection with the offense for which the
 person was arrested or charged, successfully completes a veterans
 court program established under Chapter 617, Health and Safety
 Code, if the court subsequently dismisses the criminal action
 against the person under Section 617.001(b) of that chapter.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *