House | 04/22/2009 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 1717 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1717 | |
House | 04/21/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1656 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1299 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Passed as amended | Journal Page: 1171 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1171 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Amended | Journal Page: 1171 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Duncan | Journal Page: 1170 |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1170 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1170 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1100 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1100 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1099 | |
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 899 | |
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/23/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/23/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/23/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/23/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 483 | |
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 483 | |
Senate | 02/25/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/25/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |