Senate | 04/30/2009 | Removed from local & uncontested calendar | Journal Page: 1777 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1226 | |
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Referred to Agriculture & Rural Affairs | Journal Page: 484 | |
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 484 | |
Senate | 02/25/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/25/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |