House | 05/23/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/23/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/22/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4570 | |
House | 05/22/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/22/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/21/2009 | Referred to Public Safety | Journal Page: 4301 | |
House | 05/21/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 4301 | |
House | 05/20/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 4219 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2725 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2580 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Passed as amended | Journal Page: 2580 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Amended | Journal Page: 2580 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Uresti | Journal Page: 2580 |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2580 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2580 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2580 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2524 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2524 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Amended | Journal Page: 2524 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | FA6 Uresti | Journal Page: 2524 |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2524 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Amendment tabled | Journal Page: 2524 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Amendment withdrawn | Journal Page: 2522 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2521 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2521 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 2394 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/23/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 645 | |
Senate | 03/16/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 502 | |
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 487 | |
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 487 | |
Senate | 02/26/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/26/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |