House | 04/20/2009 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 1597 | |
House | 04/20/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1597 | |
House | 04/16/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1269 | |
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1108 | |
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1044 | |
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1044 | |
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1044 | |
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1044 | |
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1041 | |
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1040 | |
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Amended | Journal Page: 1040 | |
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Hinojosa | Journal Page: 1040 |
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1040 | |
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1040 | |
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 979 | |
Senate | 04/07/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/07/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/07/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 488 | |
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 488 | |
Senate | 02/26/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/26/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |