Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1176 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Patrick, Lucio S.B. No. 1176
 (In the Senate - Filed February 26, 2009; March 13, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 May 4, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 4, 2009,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1176 By: Patrick


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the punishment prescribed for the offense of evading
 arrest or detention.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsection (b), Section 38.04, Penal Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b) An offense under this section is a Class A [B]
 misdemeanor, except that the offense is:
 (1) a state jail felony if:
 (A)  the actor has been previously convicted under
 this section; or
 (B) the actor uses a vehicle while the actor is in
 flight and the actor has not been previously convicted under this
 section;
 (2) a felony of the third degree if:
 (A) the actor uses a vehicle while the actor is in
 flight and the actor has been previously convicted under this
 section; or
 (B) another suffers serious bodily injury as a
 direct result of an attempt by the officer from whom the actor is
 fleeing to apprehend the actor while the actor is in flight; or
 (3) a felony of the second degree if another suffers
 death as a direct result of an attempt by the officer from whom the
 actor is fleeing to apprehend the actor while the actor is in
 flight.
 SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
 covered by the law in effect when the offense was committed, and the
 former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For purposes of
 this section, an offense was committed before the effective date of
 this Act if any element of the offense was committed before that
 date.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *