Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1190 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Duncan, Averitt, Seliger S.B. No. 1190
 (In the Senate - Filed February 26, 2009; March 13, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources;
 March 31, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 11,
 Nays 0; March 31, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the enforcement of rules by a groundwater conservation
 district.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 36.102, Water Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 36.102. ENFORCEMENT OF RULES. (a) A district may
 enforce this chapter and its rules against any person by
 injunction, mandatory injunction, or other appropriate remedy in a
 court of competent jurisdiction.
 (b) The board by rule may set reasonable civil penalties
 against any person for breach of any rule of the district not to
 exceed $10,000 per day per violation, and each day of a continuing
 violation constitutes a separate violation.
 (c) A penalty under this section is in addition to any other
 penalty provided by the law of this state and may be enforced
 against any person by complaints filed in the appropriate court of
 jurisdiction in the county in which the district's principal office
 or meeting place is located.
 (d) If the district prevails in any suit to enforce its
 rules, the district may seek and the court shall grant against any
 person, in the same action, recovery for attorney's fees, costs for
 expert witnesses, and other costs incurred by the district before
 the court. The amount of the attorney's fees shall be fixed by the
 court.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *