Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1191 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Ellis S.B. No. 1191


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to this state's goal for reducing statewide peak electric
 demand through demand response and load management programs.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 39.905(a), Utilities Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a) It is the goal of the legislature that:
 (1) electric utilities will administer energy
 efficiency incentive programs in a market-neutral,
 nondiscriminatory manner but will not offer underlying competitive
 services;
 (2) all customers, in all customer classes, will have
 a choice of and access to energy efficiency alternatives and other
 choices from the market that allow each customer to reduce energy
 consumption, peak demand, or energy costs;
 (3) each electric utility will provide, through
 market-based standard offer programs or limited, targeted,
 market-transformation programs, incentives sufficient for retail
 electric providers and competitive energy service providers to
 acquire additional cost-effective energy efficiency for
 residential and commercial customers equivalent to at least:
 (A) 10 percent of the electric utility's annual
 growth in demand of residential and commercial customers by
 December 31, 2007;
 (B) 15 percent of the electric utility's annual
 growth in demand of residential and commercial customers by
 December 31, 2008, provided that the electric utility's program
 expenditures for 2008 funding may not be greater than 75 percent
 above the utility's program budget for 2007 for residential and
 commercial customers, as included in the April 1, 2006, filing; and
 (C) 20 percent of the electric utility's annual
 growth in demand of residential and commercial customers by
 December 31, 2009, provided that the electric utility's program
 expenditures for 2009 funding may not be greater than 150 percent
 above the utility's program budget for 2007 for residential and
 commercial customers, as included in the April 1, 2006, filing;
 (4) each electric utility in the ERCOT region shall
 use its best efforts to encourage and facilitate the involvement of
 the region's retail electric providers in the delivery of
 efficiency programs and demand response programs under this
 section;
 (5) retail electric providers in the ERCOT region, and
 electric utilities outside of the ERCOT region, shall provide
 customers with energy efficiency educational materials; [and]
 (6) notwithstanding Subsection (a)(3), electric
 utilities shall continue to make available, at 2007 funding and
 participation levels, any load management standard offer programs
 developed for industrial customers and implemented prior to May 1,
 2007; and
 (7)  each electric utility shall implement load
 management and demand response programs sufficient to achieve, in
 addition to any reduction resulting from a program in existence on
 January 1, 2009, reductions in that utility's peak demand in
 amounts equivalent to at least:
 (A) one percent by December 31, 2010;
 (B) two percent by December 31, 2012;
 (C) three percent by December 31, 2014;
 (D) four percent by December 31, 2016; and
 (E) five percent by December 31, 2018.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.