House | 05/15/2009 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 3799 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3799 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3678 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2442 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2386 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2386 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2386 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2386 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2381 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Amendment adopted as amended | FA1 Wentworth | Journal Page: 2381 |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2381 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Amendment amended | Journal Page: 2381 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Amendment to amendment offered | FA2 Seliger | Journal Page: 2381 |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Wentworth | Journal Page: 2379 |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2379 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2379 | |
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1610 | |
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/07/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/07/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/07/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/07/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 489 | |
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 489 | |
Senate | 02/26/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/26/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |