Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1219 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Averitt S.B. No. 1219
 (In the Senate - Filed March 2, 2009; March 13, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Education; March 25, 2009,
 reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the
 following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; March 25, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1219 By: Van de Putte


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a parenting and paternity awareness component of the
 health curriculum used in public high schools.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsection (p), Section 28.002, Education Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (p) The State Board of Education, in conjunction with the
 office of the attorney general, shall develop a parenting and
 paternity awareness program that a school district shall use in the
 district's high school health curriculum. At the discretion of the
 district, a teacher may modify the suggested sequence and pace of
 the program. The program must:
 (1) address parenting skills and responsibilities,
 including child support and other legal rights and responsibilities
 that come with parenthood;
 (2) address relationship skills, including money
 management, communication skills, and marriage preparation; and
 (3) in district high schools that do not have a family
 violence prevention program, address skills relating to the
 prevention of family violence.
 SECTION 2. This Act applies beginning with the 2009-2010
 school year.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *