1 | 1 | | S.B. No. 1219 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 5 | | relating to a parenting and paternity awareness component of the |
---|
6 | 6 | | health curriculum used in public high schools. |
---|
7 | 7 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 8 | | SECTION 1. Subsection (p), Section 28.002, Education Code, |
---|
9 | 9 | | is amended to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 10 | | (p) The State Board of Education, in conjunction with the |
---|
11 | 11 | | office of the attorney general, shall develop a parenting and |
---|
12 | 12 | | paternity awareness program that a school district shall use in the |
---|
13 | 13 | | district's high school health curriculum. At the discretion of the |
---|
14 | 14 | | district, a teacher may modify the suggested sequence and pace of |
---|
15 | 15 | | the program. The program must: |
---|
16 | 16 | | (1) address parenting skills and responsibilities, |
---|
17 | 17 | | including child support and other legal rights and responsibilities |
---|
18 | 18 | | that come with parenthood; |
---|
19 | 19 | | (2) address relationship skills, including money |
---|
20 | 20 | | management, communication skills, and marriage preparation; and |
---|
21 | 21 | | (3) in district high schools that do not have a family |
---|
22 | 22 | | violence prevention program, address skills relating to the |
---|
23 | 23 | | prevention of family violence. |
---|
24 | 24 | | SECTION 2. This Act applies beginning with the 2009-2010 |
---|
25 | 25 | | school year. |
---|
26 | 26 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
27 | 27 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
28 | 28 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
29 | 29 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
30 | 30 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|
31 | 31 | | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
32 | 32 | | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
33 | 33 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1219 passed the Senate on |
---|
34 | 34 | | April 9, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; |
---|
35 | 35 | | May 28, 2009, Senate refused to concur in House amendment and |
---|
36 | 36 | | requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 29, 2009, House |
---|
37 | 37 | | granted request of the Senate; May 31, 2009, Senate adopted |
---|
38 | 38 | | Conference Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 31, |
---|
39 | 39 | | Nays 0. |
---|
40 | 40 | | ______________________________ |
---|
41 | 41 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
42 | 42 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1219 passed the House, with |
---|
43 | 43 | | amendment, on May 20, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 115, |
---|
44 | 44 | | Nays 19, one present not voting; May 29, 2009, House granted |
---|
45 | 45 | | request of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee; |
---|
46 | 46 | | May 31, 2009, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the |
---|
47 | 47 | | following vote: Yeas 100, Nays 41, three present not voting. |
---|
48 | 48 | | ______________________________ |
---|
49 | 49 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
50 | 50 | | Approved: |
---|
51 | 51 | | ______________________________ |
---|
52 | 52 | | Date |
---|
53 | 53 | | ______________________________ |
---|
54 | 54 | | Governor |
---|