Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1219 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 1219


 AN ACT
 relating to a parenting and paternity awareness component of the
 health curriculum used in public high schools.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsection (p), Section 28.002, Education Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (p) The State Board of Education, in conjunction with the
 office of the attorney general, shall develop a parenting and
 paternity awareness program that a school district shall use in the
 district's high school health curriculum. At the discretion of the
 district, a teacher may modify the suggested sequence and pace of
 the program. The program must:
 (1) address parenting skills and responsibilities,
 including child support and other legal rights and responsibilities
 that come with parenthood;
 (2) address relationship skills, including money
 management, communication skills, and marriage preparation; and
 (3) in district high schools that do not have a family
 violence prevention program, address skills relating to the
 prevention of family violence.
 SECTION 2. This Act applies beginning with the 2009-2010
 school year.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1219 passed the Senate on
 April 9, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0;
 May 28, 2009, Senate refused to concur in House amendment and
 requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 29, 2009, House
 granted request of the Senate; May 31, 2009, Senate adopted
 Conference Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 31,
 Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1219 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 20, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 115,
 Nays 19, one present not voting; May 29, 2009, House granted
 request of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
 May 31, 2009, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
 following vote: Yeas 100, Nays 41, three present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor