E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5157
|
E
|
06/01/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5156
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6968
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4994
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4975
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5982
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4337
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4337
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 4337
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4336
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3488
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4930
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1295
|
Journal Page: 4929
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4929
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 4929
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Postponed
|
5/26/09 10:01 PM
|
Journal Page: 4879
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4879
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4470
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4470
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Veasey
|
Journal Page: 4470
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4470
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2553
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 1597
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1597
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1183
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1013
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 988
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 988
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 988
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 988
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 988
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 988
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 988
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 838
|
Senate
|
03/30/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
|
|
Journal Page: 544
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 544
|
Senate
|
03/02/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|