House | 05/21/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/19/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/13/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/12/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/12/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3440 | |
House | 05/11/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/11/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/11/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/08/2009 | Referred to Public Safety | Journal Page: 3038 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3038 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2452 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2096 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2000 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2000 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2000 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2000 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2000 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2000 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 2000 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1415 | |
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/07/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/07/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/07/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/07/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 545 | |
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 545 | |
Senate | 03/02/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/02/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |