Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1249 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 1249
 (In the Senate - Filed March 2, 2009; March 17, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education;
 April 20, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; April 20, 2009,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1249 By: Duncan


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of a pilot program to improve curricula
 alignment between junior colleges and general academic teaching
 institutions for engineering degree programs.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 61.821, Education Code, is amended by
 amending Subdivision (1) and adding Subdivision (4) to read as
 follows:
 (1) "Core curriculum" means the curriculum in liberal
 arts, humanities, and sciences and political, social, and cultural
 history that all undergraduate students of an institution of higher
 education are required to complete before receiving a bachelor's
 [an academic undergraduate] degree.
 (4)  "Statewide articulated transfer curricula" means,
 with respect to engineering disciplines, sets of courses, up to the
 level of an associate's degree, that will satisfy the
 lower-division requirements for bachelor's degrees in specific
 engineering disciplines, including biomedical, chemical, civil,
 computer, electrical, environmental, industrial, mechanical,
 nuclear, and petroleum engineering at a general academic teaching
 institution.
 SECTION 2. Subsection (b), Section 61.822, Education Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (b) Each institution of higher education shall adopt a core
 curriculum of no less than 42 semester credit hours, including
 specific courses comprising the curriculum. The core curriculum
 shall be consistent with the common course numbering system
 approved by the board and with the statement, recommendations, and
 rules issued by the board. The minimum core curriculum requirement
 for all academic associate's degrees shall be 42 semester credit
 hours, except for programs designated under board-approved field of
 study curricula or statewide articulated transfer curricula. An
 institution may have a core curriculum of other than 42 semester
 credit hours only if approved by the board.
 SECTION 3. Subchapter S, Chapter 61, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 61.833 to read as follows:
 Sec. 61.833.  STATEWIDE ARTICULATED TRANSFER CURRICULA FOR
 ENGINEERING DISCIPLINES; PILOT PROGRAM.  (a)  The board shall
 establish a pilot program to develop and assess methods to increase
 the number of students earning a baccalaureate degree in
 engineering.  The program shall:
 (1)  develop levels of academic attainment, including,
 if feasible, standard associate's degrees:
 (A)  for specific engineering disciplines,
 including biomedical, chemical, civil, computer, electrical,
 environmental, industrial, mechanical, nuclear, and petroleum
 engineering; or
 (B)  that provide a foundation in any engineering
 discipline;
 (2)  develop a well-defined process for transitioning
 students who earn an associate's degree or other level of academic
 attainment in an engineering discipline into an accredited
 engineering degree program at a four-year institution; and
 (3)  establish methods to provide orientation and
 advising to support students in choosing an engineering discipline
 and in completing a baccalaureate degree in engineering.
 (b)  Not later than January 1, 2011, the board, with the
 assistance of advisory committees equitably composed of
 representatives of institutions of higher education, shall develop
 statewide articulated transfer curricula for the purpose of
 developing levels of academic attainment, including, if feasible,
 standard associate's degrees, for engineering disciplines.  Each
 university system or independent institution of higher education
 that offers a degree program for which a statewide articulated
 transfer curriculum is proposed may nominate an individual to
 participate on the advisory committee for that particular
 engineering curriculum.
 (c) The statewide articulated transfer curricula shall:
 (1)  have the same rigor and content as the equivalent
 course work at an engineering program accredited by ABET,
 Incorporated, that is offered at a general academic teaching
 institution;
 (2)  minimize the time and course work required to
 complete a baccalaureate degree in engineering; and
 (3) be consistent with:
 (A)  the common course numbering system approved
 by the board; and
 (B) the recommendations and rules of the board.
 (d)  Each institution of higher education that offers an
 undergraduate degree program in an engineering discipline may
 participate in the pilot program by adopting the statewide
 articulated transfer curriculum for that discipline.
 (e)  A student who meets institutional and engineering
 degree program admission requirements and successfully completes
 the statewide articulated transfer curriculum for an engineering
 discipline developed by the board under the pilot program:
 (1)  may transfer the credit hours earned under that
 curriculum and apply those credit hours to a participating
 four-year institution's engineering degree program in a discipline
 for which the curriculum was developed; and
 (2)  shall receive full academic credit toward that
 engineering degree program for the credit hours transferred.
 (f)  A student who meets institutional and degree program
 admission requirements and who transfers from one institution of
 higher education to another without completing the statewide
 articulated transfer curriculum developed by the board for that
 engineering discipline shall receive full academic credit from a
 participating institution for each of the courses that the student
 has successfully completed in the statewide articulated transfer
 curriculum.  Following receipt of credit for each of those courses,
 the student shall be required to satisfy any additional course
 requirements in the degree program of the receiving institution.
 (g)  The board, with the assistance of advisory committees
 established under this section, shall periodically evaluate
 whether the statewide articulated transfer curricula for
 engineering disciplines:
 (1)  effectively facilitate the transition of junior
 college students and students of other two-year institutions of
 higher education into accredited four-year engineering degree
 programs; and
 (2)  have contributed to increasing the number of
 transfer students who successfully complete baccalaureate degree
 programs in engineering.
 (h)  Not later than January 1, 2011, the board shall report
 to the legislature regarding the board's progress in developing and
 evaluating statewide articulated transfer curricula for
 engineering disciplines required by this section.
 (i) This section expires January 1, 2017.
 SECTION 4. This Act does not make an appropriation. A
 provision in this Act that creates a new governmental program,
 creates a new entitlement, or imposes a new duty on a governmental
 entity is not mandatory during a fiscal period for which the
 legislature has not made a specific appropriation to implement the
 provision.
 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *