House | 04/29/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/22/2009 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 1717 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1717 | |
House | 04/21/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1657 | |
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1230 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1299 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1167 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1167 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1167 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1166 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1166 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1166 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Amended | Journal Page: 1166 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Hinojosa | Journal Page: 1165 |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1165 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1165 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1012 | |
Senate | 04/07/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/07/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/07/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 546 | |
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 546 | |
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 413 | |
Senate | 03/03/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/03/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |