E | 06/19/2009 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/19/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5157 | |
E | 06/01/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 5156 | |
House | 06/01/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 6968 | |
Senate | 05/31/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 4994 | |
Senate | 05/29/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4975 | |
House | 05/29/2009 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported | Journal Page: 5982 | |
Senate | 05/29/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 4351 | |
Senate | 05/29/2009 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) | Journal Page: 4351 | |
Senate | 05/29/2009 | Read | Journal Page: 4351 | |
Senate | 05/29/2009 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 4348 | |
Senate | 05/13/2009 | House passage as amended reported | Journal Page: 2316 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Record vote | RV#771 | Journal Page: 3240 |
House | 05/12/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 3240 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3240 | |
House | 05/11/2009 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | Journal Page: 3109 | |
House | 05/11/2009 | Amended | 3-Smithee | Journal Page: 3108 |
House | 05/11/2009 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3106 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Postponed | 5/11/09 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 2481 |
House | 05/05/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2481 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 1833 | Journal Page: 2481 |
House | 05/02/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/01/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2336 | |
House | 04/27/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 1597 | |
House | 04/20/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1597 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1183 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1013 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 988 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 988 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 988 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 988 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 988 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 988 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 988 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 756 | |
Senate | 03/25/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/25/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/25/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Referred to Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 547 | |
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 547 | |
Senate | 03/03/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/03/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |