E | 05/12/2009 | Effective on 9/1/09 | ||
E | 05/12/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2308 | |
E | 05/01/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1936 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 2296 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1884 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1936 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1872 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Record vote | RV#412 | Journal Page: 2169 |
House | 04/30/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2169 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2169 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2147 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2147 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2009 | |
House | 04/23/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/23/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/23/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 1597 | |
House | 04/20/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1597 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1183 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1013 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 988 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 988 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 988 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 988 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 988 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 988 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 988 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/01/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/01/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/01/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 838 | |
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/26/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/26/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/26/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 547 | |
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 547 | |
Senate | 03/03/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/03/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |