House
|
05/27/2009
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 5109
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Phillips
|
Journal Page: 5108
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5108
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4641
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3939
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 3434
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3434
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2673
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2140
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2075
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2075
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2075
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2075
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2075
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2075
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2075
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1354
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
|
|
Journal Page: 547
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 547
|
Senate
|
03/03/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|