House | 05/22/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/21/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/21/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4355 | |
House | 05/20/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/20/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1597 | |
House | 04/20/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1597 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1183 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1013 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 988 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 988 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 988 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 988 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 988 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 988 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 988 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/01/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/01/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/01/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 838 | |
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Referred to Government Organization | Journal Page: 548 | |
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 548 | |
Senate | 03/03/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/03/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |