Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1282 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Williams S.B. No. 1282
 (In the Senate - Filed March 3, 2009; March 17, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Homeland
 Security; March 31, 2009, reported favorably by the following
 vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; March 31, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the powers of certain freight rail districts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 171.053, Transportation Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 171.053. INTERMUNICIPAL COMMUTER RAIL DISTRICT
 POWERS. The governing bodies of the county or counties and of the
 most populous municipality in the most populous county may provide
 that the district may exercise the powers of an intermunicipal
 commuter rail district created under Article 6550c-1, Revised
 Statutes, including the powers related to a commuter rail facility,
 by specifying in the concurrent order or ordinance creating the
 district that those powers may be exercised by the district.
 SECTION 2. Subchapter F, Chapter 171, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 171.256 to read as follows:
 Sec. 171.256.  LOCAL GOVERNMENT FINANCING.  (a)  Section
 8(d), Article 6550c-1, Revised Statutes, relating to the limit on
 payments made by a local government does not apply to a district to
 which Section 171.053 applies.
 (b)  A district to which Section 171.053 applies may use
 money paid to the district by a local government outside the
 territory of the local government if the money is used for a public
 purpose of the local government.
 (c)  A district to which Section 171.053 applies may pledge
 money paid to the district by a local government to secure the
 payment of a district debt.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *